Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/23/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/23/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/23/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/23/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/23/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/15/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/15/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/01/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/12/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/27/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/18/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/01/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/10/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/05/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/09/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/15/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/21/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew