Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/16/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/17/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/06/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/06/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/16/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/28/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/04/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/06/2000