Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/17/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/31/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/31/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/31/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/08/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/15/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/16/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/01/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/30/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/30/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/03/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/03/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/18/2000