Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 11/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/21/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/21/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/21/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/27/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/07/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/18/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/18/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/10/2000