Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/18/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/08/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/15/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/30/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/20/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/20/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/13/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/13/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/02/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew