Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/10/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/10/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/10/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/16/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/16/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/16/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/08/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/30/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/11/2000