Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/31/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/31/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/31/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/08/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/22/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/22/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/28/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/03/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/17/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/17/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/13/2000