There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Leif Ericson Millennium Commemorative Coin Act
  • Lewis and Clark Expedition Bicentennial Commemorative Coin Act
  • United States Capitol Visitor Center Commemorative Coin Act of 1999

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Leif Ericson Millennium Commemorative Coin Act
  • Lewis and Clark Expedition Bicentennial Commemorative Coin Act
  • United States Capitol Visitor Center Commemorative Coin Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in conjunction with the minting of coins by the Republic of Iceland in commemoration of the millennium of the discovery of the New World by Lief Ericson.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/06/1999Became Public Law No: 106-126. (TXT | PDF)
12/06/1999Signed by President.
11/30/1999Presented to President.
11/19/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14922-14923)
11/16/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H12056-12058)
11/16/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/06/1999Became Public Law No: 106-126. (TXT | PDF)
12/06/1999Signed by President.
11/30/1999HousePresented to President.
11/22/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/19/1999SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14922-14923)
11/17/1999SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/16/1999-5:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/1999-5:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H12056-12058)
11/16/1999-5:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3373.
11/16/1999-5:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12056-12059)
11/16/1999-5:49pmHouseMr. Leach moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/16/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
11/16/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services11/16/1999 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/1999)

Title I: Leif Ericson Millennium Commemorative Coin - Leif Ericson Millennium Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue one-dollar silver coins, in conjunction with the simultaneous minting and issuance of commemorative coins by the Republic of Iceland, in commemoration of the millennium of the discovery of the New World by Leif Ericson.

Mandates that all coin surcharges be paid to the Leifur Eiriksson Foundation for the purpose of funding student exchanges between the United States and Iceland.

Title II: Capitol Visitor Center Commemorative Coin - United States Capitol Visitor Center Commemorative Coin Act of 1999 - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to issue ten-dollar bimetallic coins, one-dollar silver coins, half-dollar clad coins, and if the Secretary determines that the minting and issuance of bimetallic coins is not feasible, five-dollar gold coins emblematic of the first meeting of the United States Congress in the U.S. Capitol Building.

Mandates that all surcharges received from the coin sales be deposited in the Capitol Preservation Fund and made available to the U.S. Capitol Preservation Commission to aid in the construction, maintenance, and preservation of a Capitol Visitor Center.

Title III: Lewis and Clark Expedition Commemorative Coin - Lewis and Clark Expedition Bicentennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue one-dollar coins emblematic of the expedition of Lewis and Clark.

Allocates surcharges from coin sales between the National Lewis and Clark Bicentennial Council and the National Park Service for activities associated with the bicentennial commemoration of the expedition.