Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/16/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/16/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/16/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/18/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/18/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/18/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/19/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/19/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/01/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/01/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/01/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/01/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/01/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/01/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/01/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/01/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/01/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/08/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/08/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/10/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/10/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/08/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/08/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/13/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/10/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/10/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/18/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2000