Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/16/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/14/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/14/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/14/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/14/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/14/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/14/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/14/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/14/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/14/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/12/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/12/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/12/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/12/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/04/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2000