Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/02/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/02/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/02/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/02/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/02/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/02/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/02/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/02/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/02/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 02/16/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/16/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/01/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/01/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/29/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/29/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/28/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/28/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/28/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/28/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/28/2000