Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/22/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/22/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/03/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/03/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/03/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/03/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/10/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/10/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/10/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/10/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/10/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/10/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/10/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/10/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/22/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/22/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/22/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/06/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/15/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/27/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/29/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/10/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/20/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/26/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/26/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/26/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/26/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/14/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/05/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/05/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/05/2000