Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/22/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/24/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/24/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/24/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/24/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/24/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/24/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/24/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/24/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/24/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/24/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 01/24/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 01/24/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 01/24/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/24/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/24/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/24/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/24/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/24/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 01/24/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/27/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/27/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/27/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/31/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 01/31/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/31/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/31/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/01/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/01/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/01/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/01/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/07/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 02/07/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/07/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/07/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/07/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/09/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/09/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/09/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/10/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/10/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/16/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/16/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/16/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/16/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/16/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/29/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/29/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/06/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/06/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/06/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/06/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/06/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/06/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/06/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/13/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/13/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/13/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/20/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/20/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/22/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/22/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/28/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/04/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/04/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/10/2000