Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/05/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/11/2000