Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 11/18/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/16/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/16/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/16/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/15/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/15/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/03/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/10/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/23/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/12/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/12/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/15/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/15/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/23/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/20/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/20/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/20/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/20/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/19/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/02/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/17/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/17/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/17/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/26/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/11/2000