Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/02/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/02/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/02/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/02/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/08/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/08/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/08/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/08/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/08/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/08/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/08/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/08/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/09/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/09/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/23/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/23/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/23/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/23/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/24/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/01/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/01/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/01/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/03/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/10/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 03/11/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/15/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/15/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/18/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/18/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/23/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/12/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/22/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/29/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/29/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/05/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/11/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/14/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/18/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/19/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew