Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/22/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/22/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/27/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 01/27/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/27/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/27/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/07/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/07/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/07/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/29/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/29/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/29/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/29/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/09/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/09/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/09/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/14/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/30/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/13/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/09/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/16/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/22/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/22/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/25/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/18/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/25/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/06/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/07/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/07/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/12/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/12/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/12/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/26/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/27/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/27/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/28/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/02/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/02/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/02/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/05/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/05/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/05/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/05/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/05/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/10/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/10/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/11/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/17/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/23/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/23/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/23/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/23/2000