There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 to provide that the Act will not apply to employment performed with an electronic device in a workplace located in the employee's residence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/14/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/24/2000Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/31/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/14/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/15/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/12/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/04/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/09/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/19/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/26/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/24/2000 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections02/14/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3518.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3518. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2000)

Amends the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 to make the Act inapplicable to employment performed in a workplace through the use of a telephone, computer, or other electronic device which is located in the employee's residence.