Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/31/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/14/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/15/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/12/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/04/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/22/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/09/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/20/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/19/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/26/2000