Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/15/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/04/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/09/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/19/2000