Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/31/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/14/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/15/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/12/2000