Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/24/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 01/24/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/24/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/24/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/27/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/27/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/31/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/31/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/31/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/01/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/01/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/07/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/07/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/07/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/08/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/08/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/08/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/08/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/09/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/09/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/09/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/15/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/16/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/06/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/06/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2000