There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Shark Finning Prohibition Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Shark Finning Prohibition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to eliminate the wasteful and unsportsmanlike practice of shark finning.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/06/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 1 (Roll no. 237).(text: CR H3882)
06/06/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-650.
01/27/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/07/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
06/06/2000-6:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/06/2000-6:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 1 (Roll no. 237). (text: CR H3882)
06/06/2000-6:40pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3891-3892)
06/06/2000-1:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/06/2000-1:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3535.
06/06/2000-1:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3882-3885)
06/06/2000-1:15pmHouseMr. Sherwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/06/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 360.
06/06/2000HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-650.
05/24/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/24/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/18/2000HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
05/18/2000HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
04/13/2000HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans
02/02/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/27/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
01/27/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/27/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/07/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/07/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/07/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/07/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/07/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/29/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/08/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources01/27/2000 Referred to
05/24/2000 Markup by
06/06/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-650
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans02/02/2000 Referred to
04/13/2000 Hearings by
05/18/2000 Markup by
05/18/2000 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/07/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3535.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3535. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/06/2000)

Shark Finning Prohibition Act - Amends the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to make it unlawful to: (1) remove any of the fins of a shark, including the tail, and discard the carcass of the shark at sea; (2) have control or possession of such a fin aboard a fishing vessel without the corresponding carcass; or (3) land such a fin without the corresponding carcass.