Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/27/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/07/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/07/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/07/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/07/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/07/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/29/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/08/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2000