Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/08/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/29/2000