Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/01/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/03/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/03/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/03/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/03/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/03/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/03/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/03/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/03/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/03/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/03/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/03/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/03/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/03/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/03/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/03/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/03/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/08/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/08/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/08/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/10/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/10/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/14/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/14/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/14/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/14/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/14/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/03/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/28/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/28/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/12/2000