Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/27/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 01/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/27/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/27/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/31/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/31/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/31/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/31/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/31/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/31/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/02/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/14/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/14/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/16/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/15/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/15/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/15/2000