Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/04/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/04/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/04/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/04/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/04/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/04/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/08/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/25/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/25/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/25/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/16/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/18/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/18/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/24/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/24/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/14/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/14/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/02/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 08/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/06/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/01/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/22/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2000