Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/02/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/02/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/08/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/29/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/08/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/21/2000