Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 01/31/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 01/31/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/31/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/31/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/31/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 01/31/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 01/31/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/31/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/08/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/08/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/10/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/10/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/14/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/14/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/15/2000