Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/01/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/16/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/19/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/21/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/27/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/11/2000