Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/14/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/16/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/06/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/09/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/05/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/05/2000