Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/09/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/09/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/21/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/21/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/28/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/30/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/03/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/03/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/11/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/11/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/03/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/03/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/03/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/11/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/23/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/07/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/14/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/06/2000