Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/08/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/08/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/08/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 02/08/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/10/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/10/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/10/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/14/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/14/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/14/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/15/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/15/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/15/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/16/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/29/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/29/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/29/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/08/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/08/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/08/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/08/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/08/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/09/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/09/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/14/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/21/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/21/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/09/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/22/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/07/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/18/2000