Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/09/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/09/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/09/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/09/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/09/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/09/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/09/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/14/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/14/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/14/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/14/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/14/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/14/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/14/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/14/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/14/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/14/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/14/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/14/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/15/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/15/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/15/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/15/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/15/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/16/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/16/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/29/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/01/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/08/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/08/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/08/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/15/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/15/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/15/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/22/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/23/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/28/2000