Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/21/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/21/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/21/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/21/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/21/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/04/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/22/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/21/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/22/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/22/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/23/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/20/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/20/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/20/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/20/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/18/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/27/2000