Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/10/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/01/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/01/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/01/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/01/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/22/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/22/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/22/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/02/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/19/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2000