Committees: H.R.3615 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/10/2000 Referred to
02/16/2000 Markup by
03/01/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-508,Part 1
House Commerce02/10/2000 Referred to
03/29/2000 Markup by
04/06/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-508,Part 2
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection02/15/2000 Referred to
03/16/2000 Hearings by
03/23/2000 Markup by
03/23/2000 Reported by
House Judiciary02/10/2000 Referred to
03/31/2000 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property02/15/2000 Referred to