Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/01/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/13/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/13/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/03/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/03/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/03/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/03/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/03/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/03/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/03/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/03/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/03/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/03/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/04/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/04/2000
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/09/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/09/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/09/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/09/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/09/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/10/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/10/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/10/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/10/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/10/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/10/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/10/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/10/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/11/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/11/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/11/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/11/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/11/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/11/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/11/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/11/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/11/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/16/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/16/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/16/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/18/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/18/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/18/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/18/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/18/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/18/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/22/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/27/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/29/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/29/2000