Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/03/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/03/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/03/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/03/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/03/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/03/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/11/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/15/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/10/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/25/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/05/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/17/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/30/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/08/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/09/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/18/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/12/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/26/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/27/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/27/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/27/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/19/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/19/2000