Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/10/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/14/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/15/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/15/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/15/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/15/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/15/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/15/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/15/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/15/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/29/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/29/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/29/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/29/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/06/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/06/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/09/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/15/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/15/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/15/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/15/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/27/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/02/2000