There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improved Medical Care for Troops and Retirees Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make certain improvements to the military health care system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/15/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
02/22/2000Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/22/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/22/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
02/18/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/17/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
02/15/2000Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Commerce, and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/09/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/17/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/17/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/18/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/14/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/14/2000

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/15/2000 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/18/2000 Referred to
House Armed Services02/15/2000 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/22/2000 Referred to
House Commerce02/15/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/22/2000 Referred to
House Government Reform02/15/2000 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service02/17/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3655.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3655. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2000)

Improved Medical Care for Troops and Retirees Act - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act, Federal armed forces law, the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 1998, and the Strom Thurmond National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 1999 to provide, among other things, for: (1) making permanent the current Medicare subvention demonstration project for military retirees and dependents; (2) extending the Federal Employees Health Benefits Optional Demonstration Project; (3) entitling family members of members of the armed forces assigned to certain duty locations far from sources of care to the medical and dental care otherwise available to such member in any facility of any uniformed service; (4) requiring the pharmacy benefits provided under the redesigned pharmacy system under the TRICARE program (a managed health care program of the armed forces) to be at least equivalent to those provided under the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 1993; and (5) eliminating copayments under TRICARE Prime, and imposing a reduction in the catastrophic cap under TRICARE Standard and TRICARE Extra.

Authorizes appropriations for the redesigned pharmacy system under the Strom Thurmond National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 1999.