There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Ombudsman Reauthorization Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Solid Waste Disposal Act to reauthorize the Office of Ombudsman of the Environmental Protection Agency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/15/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/22/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
02/15/2000Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E149)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/21/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/05/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce02/15/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials02/22/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3656. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2000)

Ombudsman Reauthorization Act of 2000 - Amends the Solid Waste Disposal Act to extend the termination date for the Office of Ombudsman to the date ten years after this Act's enactment. (Current law provides for termination four years after November 8, 1984.)

Requires the Ombudsman to report to Congress on the status of health and environmental concerns addressed by cases brought before the Ombudsman and recommend improvements to the hazardous waste programs for which the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) and the Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry are responsible.

Directs the EPA Administrator to facilitate the structuring of the Office to conform to the structure reflected in the Model Ombudsman Statute of the American Bar Association.