Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/15/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/15/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/15/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/01/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/01/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/01/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/01/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/21/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/21/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/28/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 03/28/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/28/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/03/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/03/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/04/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/04/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew