Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/15/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/22/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/29/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/29/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/29/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/29/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/29/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/29/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/29/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/29/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/29/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/29/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/29/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/29/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/29/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/06/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/03/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/03/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/15/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/13/2000