Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/16/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/09/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/09/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/09/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/09/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/09/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/11/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/11/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/11/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/16/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/18/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/08/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/09/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/09/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/13/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/15/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/15/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/15/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/15/2000