Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/16/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/16/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/06/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/06/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/06/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/06/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/10/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/11/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/06/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/12/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/27/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/29/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/26/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/12/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/23/2000