Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/01/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/01/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/01/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/28/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/28/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/04/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/04/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/04/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/04/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/04/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/04/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/06/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/06/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/06/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/06/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/06/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/06/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/04/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/04/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/04/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/04/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/10/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/10/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/10/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/17/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/25/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/25/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/25/2000