Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/16/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/29/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/29/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/08/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/06/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/06/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/10/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/10/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/10/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/10/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/10/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/10/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/10/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/10/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/10/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/11/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/17/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/17/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/17/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/17/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/17/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/17/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/18/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/18/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/18/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/18/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/18/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/18/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/24/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/24/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/24/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/24/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/24/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/06/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/14/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/15/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/12/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew