Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/09/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/14/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/22/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/18/2000